TN HB1847 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c TennCare Subcommittee of Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires that doula services be provided to recipients of TennCare; requires that the doula services be performed by a person who has received certain certification. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8; Title 56 and Title 71.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires that doula services be provided to recipients of TennCare; requires that the doula services be performed by a person who has received certain certification. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8; Title 56 and Title 71.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-11HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c TennCare Subcommittee of Insurance Committee
2020-03-04HousePlaced on s/c cal TennCare Subcommittee for 3/11/2020
2020-03-04HouseAction Def. in s/c TennCare Subcommittee to 3/11/2020
2020-02-26HousePlaced on s/c cal TennCare Subcommittee for 3/4/2020
2020-01-27HouseAssigned to s/c TennCare Subcommittee
2020-01-27HouseP2C, ref. to Insurance Committee
2020-01-23HouseIntro., P1C.
2020-01-22HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1804 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback