TN HB1845 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-31 - Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-31 - Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes dental hygienists under the general supervision of a dentist to establish or maintain an independent practice or office that is primarily devoted to providing dental hygiene services. - Amends TCA Title 63, Chapter 5.
Title
As introduced, authorizes dental hygienists under the general supervision of a dentist to establish or maintain an independent practice or office that is primarily devoted to providing dental hygiene services. - Amends TCA Title 63, Chapter 5.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-31 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2018-01-29 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2018-01-25 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-24 | House | Filed for intro. |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1845&ga=110 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/110/Bill/HB1845.pdf |