TN HB1844 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Failed in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee of State Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Failed in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee of State Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits the commissioner of finance and administration from disbursing moneys from the state treasury to private entities that do not pay their employees a living wage; prohibits state governmental entities from disbursing state funds to private entities that do not pay their employees a living wage; requires state contracts to include language requiring such entities to pay their employees a living wage; defines "living wage" as at least $12.50 per hour worked. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 9; Title 12; Title 50 and Title 67.
Title
As introduced, prohibits the commissioner of finance and administration from disbursing moneys from the state treasury to private entities that do not pay their employees a living wage; prohibits state governmental entities from disbursing state funds to private entities that do not pay their employees a living wage; requires state contracts to include language requiring such entities to pay their employees a living wage; defines "living wage" as at least $12.50 per hour worked. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 9; Title 12; Title 50 and Title 67.
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Hodges [D] | Sen. London Lamar [D] | Rep. John Clemmons [D] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] |
Rep. Joe Towns [D] | Rep. Antonio Parkinson [D] | Rep. Larry Miller [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Failed in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee of State Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-02-18 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee of State Committee |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 2/18/2020 |
2020-01-27 | House | Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2020-01-27 | House | P2C, ref. to State Committee |
2020-01-23 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-22 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2400 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee