TN HB1838 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-26 - Assigned to s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, establishes certain civil remedies for an employer against any employee who exceeds the employee's authority to enter nonpublic areas of the employer's premises. - Amends TCA Title 50.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, establishes certain civil remedies for an employer against any employee who exceeds the employee's authority to enter nonpublic areas of the employer's premises. - Amends TCA Title 50.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-01-26HouseAssigned to s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee
2016-01-21HouseP2C, ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee
2016-01-20HouseIntro., P1C.
2016-01-19HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB1691 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-01 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback