TN HB1837 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-27 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-27 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, adds the government operations committees to the list of committees that are to receive a copy of the consolidated report on the Help America Vote Act from the secretary of state each year. - Amends TCA Title 2 and Title 40, Chapter 29.
Title
As introduced, adds the government operations committees to the list of committees that are to receive a copy of the consolidated report on the Help America Vote Act from the secretary of state each year. - Amends TCA Title 2 and Title 40, Chapter 29.
Sponsors
Rep. Clark Boyd [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-27 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2020-01-23 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-22 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1574 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-16 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee