TN HB1836 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 526
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 526
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, adds representatives of the Tennessee commission on aging and disability, the Tennessee Nurses Association, and the department of mental health and substance abuse services as members of the state Alzheimer's disease and related dementia advisory council. - Amends TCA Title 71, Chapter 2, Part 1.
Title
As enacted, adds representatives of the Tennessee commission on aging and disability, the Tennessee Nurses Association, and the department of mental health and substance abuse services as members of the state Alzheimer's disease and related dementia advisory council. - Amends TCA Title 71, Chapter 2, Part 1.
Sponsors
Rep. Sam Whitson [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 526 | |
2020-02-20 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2020-02-13 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 2/20/2020 |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/13/2020 |
2020-02-11 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 2/11/2020 |
2020-02-04 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Health Subcommittee for 2/4/2020 |
2020-01-27 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Health Subcommittee |
2020-01-27 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2020-01-23 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-22 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1959 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-16 - Pub. Ch. 526