TN HB1830 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-06 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-06 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires certain departments to create programs to reduce gun violence in communities, including a youth employment program, violence intervention program, and firearm buyback program; requires the department of health to submit a quarterly report to the legislature and counties and municipalities on the effects of gun violence in communities. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 38; Title 39; Title 49; Title 50; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 38; Title 39; Title 49; Title 50; Title 68 and Title 71, relative to gun violence.
Sponsors
Rep. Antonio Parkinson [D] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] | Rep. Harold Love [D] | Rep. Bill Beck [D] |
Rep. Vincent Dixie [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-06 | House | Returned to the Clerk's Desk. |
2022-04-06 | House | Def. to Special Calendar to be Published with Final Calendar in Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2022-03-30 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 4/6/2022 |
2022-03-30 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 4/6/2022 |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-23 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-07 | House | Sponsor change. |
2022-03-02 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/9/2022 |
2022-02-23 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/9/2022 |
2022-02-16 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/23/2022 |
2022-02-16 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 2/23/2022 |
2022-02-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/16/2022 |
2022-02-09 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 2/16/2022 |
2022-02-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/9/2022 |
2022-01-26 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2022-01-24 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee -- Commerce Committee |
2022-01-20 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-01-19 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1773 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-22 - Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee