TN HB1824 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 720
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 720
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, updates references in vocational rehabilitation statutes to reflect current nomenclature for the division of rehabilitation services and the director of the vocation rehabilitation program; removes certain requirements concerning services offered by the division of rehabilitation services. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 11, Part 6; Title 49, Chapter 11, Part 7 and Title 49, Chapter 11, Part 8.
Title
As enacted, updates references in vocational rehabilitation statutes to reflect current nomenclature for the division of rehabilitation services and the director of the vocation rehabilitation program; removes certain requirements concerning services offered by the division of rehabilitation services. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 11, Part 6; Title 49, Chapter 11, Part 7 and Title 49, Chapter 11, Part 8.
Sponsors
Rep. David Hawk [R] | Rep. Glen Casada [R] | Rep. Sam Whitson [R] | Rep. Rick Staples [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 720 | |
2018-03-29 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2018-03-29 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-22 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/29/2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/22/2018 |
2018-03-20 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 3/20/2018 |
2018-03-13 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/13/2018 |
2018-01-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee |
2018-01-25 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2018-01-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-23 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2249 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-23 - Pub. Ch. 720