TN HB1819 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 754
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 754
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, conditions a firefighter's use of the presumption that certain conditions arose out of the firefighter's employment on the firefighter obtaining a physical medical examination that confirms the firefighter to be cancer-free. - Amends TCA Section 7-51-201.
Title
As enacted, conditions a firefighter's use of the presumption that certain conditions arose out of the firefighter's employment on the firefighter obtaining a physical medical examination that confirms the firefighter to be cancer-free. - Amends TCA Section 7-51-201.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 70 N: 1 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-02 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 754 | |
2020-06-15 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2020-06-11 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 6/15/2020 |
2020-06-10 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 6/11/2020 |
2020-03-11 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on cal. Local Committee for 3/11/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Committee |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Cities & Counties Subcommittee for 3/4/2020 |
2020-01-27 | House | Assigned to s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee |
2020-01-27 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Committee |
2020-01-23 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-22 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2863 (Crossfiled) 2020-07-02 - Pub. Ch. 754