TN HB1819 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 741
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 741
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, broadens the definition of financial institution to include a trust company and institutions that are organized under the laws of other states for purposes of conversion of charter and resulting institutions; requires a financial institution that results from a conversion to have its principal place of business in this state. - Amends TCA Title 45, Chapter 1; Title 45, Chapter 11 and Title 45, Chapter 2.
Title
As enacted, broadens the definition of financial institution to include a trust company and institutions that are organized under the laws of other states for purposes of conversion of charter and resulting institutions; requires a financial institution that results from a conversion to have its principal place of business in this state. - Amends TCA Title 45, Chapter 1; Title 45, Chapter 11 and Title 45, Chapter 2.
Sponsors
Rep. David Hawk [R] | Rep. Glen Casada [R] | Rep. Dennis Powers [R] | Rep. Ryan Williams [R] |
Rep. Bill Dunn [R] | Rep. Eddie Smith [R] | Rep. Courtney Rogers [R] | Rep. Jim Coley [R] |
Rep. Mark White [R] | Rep. Marc Gravitt [R] | Rep. Ron Gant [R] | Rep. Dan Howell [R] |
Rep. Kevin Vaughan [R] | Rep. Ron Travis [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-02 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 741 | |
2018-04-02 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2018-03-29 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/2/2018 |
2018-03-28 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/29/2018 |
2018-03-27 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/27/2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/14/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 3/14/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2018-02-27 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on cal. Insurance and Banking Committee for 2/27/2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 2/21/2018 |
2018-02-14 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee to 2/21/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 2/14/2018 |
2018-02-06 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-01-31 | House | Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 2/7/2018 |
2018-01-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee |
2018-01-25 | House | P2C, ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee |
2018-01-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-23 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2243 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-23 - Pub. Ch. 741