TN HB1811 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, extends the Tennessee emergency medical services board to June 30, 2027. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 68, Chapter 140, Part 3.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 68, Chapter 140, Part 3, relative to the Tennessee emergency medical services board.
Sponsors
Rep. John Ragan [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-04-19 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2022-04-18 | House | Passed H., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2022-04-14 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/18/2022 |
2022-04-13 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/14/2022 |
2022-04-11 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-04-06 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/11/2022 |
2022-01-24 | House | P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2022-01-20 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-01-18 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1730 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-05 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health & Welfare Committee