TN HB1807 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Pub. Ch. 854
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Pub. Ch. 854
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, specifies that the department of agriculture may cooperate with the United States food and drug administration in enforcement of the federal standards for the growing, harvesting, packing, and holding of produce for human consumption. - Amends TCA Title 53, Chapter 1.
Title
As enacted, specifies that the department of agriculture may cooperate with the United States food and drug administration in enforcement of the federal standards for the growing, harvesting, packing, and holding of produce for human consumption. - Amends TCA Title 53, Chapter 1.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-23 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 1 (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-02 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-02 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Pub. Ch. 854 | |
2018-05-08 | Effective date(s) 05/03/2018 | |
2018-05-03 | Signed by Governor. | |
2018-04-26 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-04-24 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-04-24 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2018-04-23 | House | H. concurred in S. am. no. 1 Ayes 90, Nays 1 PNV 1 HB1807 |
2018-04-19 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/23/2018 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 26, Nays 1 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0821) |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-04-03 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2018-04-02 | House | Passed H., Ayes 89, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2018-03-29 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/2/2018 |
2018-03-28 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/29/2018 |
2018-03-27 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/27/2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-03-16 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2018-03-14 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/14/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Action def. in Government Operations Committee to 3/14/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-27 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Government Operations Committee |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 2/27/2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 2/21/2018 |
2018-01-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2018-01-25 | House | P2C, ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee-- Government Operations for Review |
2018-01-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-23 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2231 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-08 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 854