TN HB1806 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, renames the current Visual Content Act of 2006 and expands the current act by establishing a visual content expansion fund as a separate account to provide grants to expand job and business ownership opportunities for Tennesseans in industries related to motion pictures, television, video gaming, or digital media. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 49 and Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 50.
Title
As introduced, renames the current Visual Content Act of 2006 and expands the current act by establishing a visual content expansion fund as a separate account to provide grants to expand job and business ownership opportunities for Tennesseans in industries related to motion pictures, television, video gaming, or digital media. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 49 and Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 50.
Sponsors
Rep. Pat Marsh [R] | Rep. John Clemmons [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | House | Withdrawn. |
2018-02-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee |
2018-01-25 | House | P2C, ref. to Business and Utilities Committee |
2018-01-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-23 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1818 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-23 - Withdrawn.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1806&ga=110 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/110/Bill/HB1806.pdf |