TN HB1804 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-11 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-11 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits a state or local licensing authority from entering into a contract with a lobbyist or a lobbying firm. - Amends TCA Title 3, Chapter 6, Part 3.
Title
As introduced, prohibits a state or local licensing authority from entering into a contract with a lobbyist or a lobbying firm. - Amends TCA Title 3, Chapter 6, Part 3.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/11/2018 |
2018-04-09 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to Next Calendar |
2018-04-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/9/2018 |
2018-03-28 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/14/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2018-03-06 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/6/2018 |
2018-02-27 | House | Action def. in State Government Committee to 3/6/2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 2/27/2018 |
2018-02-20 | House | Action def. in State Government Committee to 2/27/2018 |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 2/20/2018 |
2018-02-14 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2018-02-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/14/2018 |
2018-01-30 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2018-01-29 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-01-25 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2018-01-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-23 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2473 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-04 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.