TN HB1802 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-10 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020
Pending: House Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-10 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020
Pending: House Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, adds administration of a controlled substance or narcotic drug to a victim without the victim's consent or knowledge for the purpose of incapacitating the victim to the circumstances under which a rape becomes an aggravated rape. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 5.
Title
As introduced, adds administration of a controlled substance or narcotic drug to a victim without the victim's consent or knowledge for the purpose of incapacitating the victim to the circumstances under which a rape becomes an aggravated rape. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 5.
Sponsors
Rep. Andrew Farmer [R] | Rep. Brandon Ogles [R] | Rep. Bruce Griffey [R] | Sen. London Lamar [D] |
Rep. Bob Ramsey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020 |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 2/26/2020 |
2020-02-19 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2020-02-12 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary for 2/12/2020 |
2020-02-04 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Judiciary |
2020-01-29 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/4/2020 |
2020-01-23 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2020-01-23 | House | P2C, ref. to Judiciary |
2020-01-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-21 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2000 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-11 - Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee