TN HB1799 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-03 - Held on desk
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-03 - Held on desk
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, removes residency requirements for any person applying for a retail license. - Amends TCA Section 57-3-204.
Title
As introduced, removes residency requirements for any person applying for a retail license. - Amends TCA Section 57-3-204.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-03 | Senate | Held on desk |
2020-05-29 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/2/2020 |
2020-05-28 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/29/2020 |
2020-05-27 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 5/27/2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-10 | House | Action def. in State Committee to 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-03-03 | House | Meeting Canceled. Reset on State Committee cal. for 3/10/20 |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-25 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Committee |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 2/25/2020 |
2020-01-23 | House | Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2020-01-23 | House | P2C, ref. to State Committee |
2020-01-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-21 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2478 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-16 - Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm.