TN HB1798 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-27 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-27 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes the county election commission to notify individuals filing a petition for recall, referendum, or initiative of a defect in the petition that must be cured prior to certification for final approval. - Amends TCA Title 2.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 2, relative to elections.
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Rudd [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-27 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Government Committee |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 3/27/2024 |
2024-03-20 | House | Action Def. in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee to 3/27/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 3/20/2024 |
2024-01-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee |
2024-01-22 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2024-01-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1705 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-27 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee