TN HB1796 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-27 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Public Health Subcommittee of Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-27 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Public Health Subcommittee of Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires that signage concerning minimum age to purchase tobacco products that is posted or replaced by retailers on or after July 1, 2020, must also specify that the age restriction applies to sales of vapor products. - Amends TCA Title 39.
Title
As introduced, requires that signage concerning minimum age to purchase tobacco products that is posted or replaced by retailers on or after July 1, 2020, must also specify that the age restriction applies to sales of vapor products. - Amends TCA Title 39.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-27 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Public Health Subcommittee of Health Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Health Subcommittee for 5/27/2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Health Subcommittee for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-10 | House | Action Def. in s/c Public Health Subcommittee to 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Health Subcommittee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Health Subcommittee |
2020-03-04 | House | Ref. to Health Committee-- Local Committee |
2020-01-23 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2020-01-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-21 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1771 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee