TN HB1786 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-09 - Taken off notice for cal. in Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-09 - Taken off notice for cal. in Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, extends the Tennessee radiologic imaging and radiation therapy board of examiners to June 30, 2022. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 63, Chapter 6, Part 9.
Title
As introduced, extends the Tennessee radiologic imaging and radiation therapy board of examiners to June 30, 2022. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 63, Chapter 6, Part 9.
Sponsors
Rep. Martin Daniel [R] | Rep. Bill Dunn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-09 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Government Operations Committee |
2020-06-03 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 6/9/2020 |
2020-03-18 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Government Operations Committee |
2020-03-17 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/18/2020 |
2020-01-23 | House | P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2020-01-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-21 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1708 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-27 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.