TN HB1777 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-30 - Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, creates a process for automatic voter registration by county election commissions after a person completes an application for a driver license, photo identification license, or handgun carry permit with the department of safety. - Amends TCA Title 2 and Title 55, Chapter 50.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, creates a process for automatic voter registration by county election commissions after a person completes an application for a driver license, photo identification license, or handgun carry permit with the department of safety. - Amends TCA Title 2 and Title 55, Chapter 50.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-30HouseAssigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee
2018-01-25HouseP2C, ref. to Local Government Committee-- Government Operations for Review
2018-01-24HouseIntro., P1C.
2018-01-23HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB1767 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-25 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback