TN HB1766 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-5)
Status: Passed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 643
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-5)
Status: Passed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 643
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires a court to revoke bail immediately, notwithstanding sentencing hearings, motions for a new trial, or related post-guilt determination hearings, for a defendant who is convicted of continuous sexual abuse of a child. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 11, Part 1.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 40, Chapter 11, Part 1, relative to bail.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 643 | |
2022-02-24 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2022-02-17 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-17 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/24/2022 |
2022-02-16 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/17/2022 |
2022-02-09 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-07 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-03 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-02 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 2/9/2022 |
2022-02-02 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-01-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/2/2022 |
2022-01-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2022-01-20 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2022-01-19 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-01-18 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1793 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-15 - Effective date(s) 03/11/2022