TN HB1763 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Pub. Ch. 767
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Pub. Ch. 767
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends the regional transportation authority of Middle Tennessee to June 30, 2021. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 64, Chapter 8, Part 1.
Title
As enacted, extends the regional transportation authority of Middle Tennessee to June 30, 2021. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 64, Chapter 8, Part 1.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 1 (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-22 | Pub. Ch. 767 | |
2020-07-22 | Effective date(s) 07/15/2020 | |
2020-07-15 | Signed by Governor. | |
2020-07-06 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2020-06-30 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2020-06-19 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2020-06-17 | House | H. concurred in S. am. no. 1 Ayes 89, Nays 0 PNV 0 HB1763 |
2020-06-17 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 6/17/20 |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0697) |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-03-17 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2020-03-16 | House | Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2020-03-13 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/16/2020 |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/12/2020 |
2020-03-09 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/9/2020 |
2020-01-23 | House | P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2020-01-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-21 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1685 (Crossfiled) 2020-07-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 767