TN HB1755 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Failed for lack of second in: Business and Utilities Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee Neutrality and Internet Consumer Protection Act." - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 10; Title 12; Title 65; Title 67 and Title 68.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee Neutrality and Internet Consumer Protection Act." - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 10; Title 12; Title 65; Title 67 and Title 68.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-13HouseFailed for lack of second in: Business and Utilities Subcommittee
2018-03-12HouseSponsor(s) withdrawn.
2018-03-07HousePlaced on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/13/2018
2018-03-07HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-03-06HouseAction Def. in s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee to 3/13/2018
2018-03-01HousePlaced on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/6/2018
2018-02-14HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-01-30HouseP2C, ref. to Business and Utilities Subcommittee
2018-01-30HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-01-25HouseP2C, ref. to Business and Utilities Committee-- Government Operations for Review
2018-01-24HouseIntro., P1C.
2018-01-23HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB1756 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-14 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback