TN HB1751 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 592
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 592
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends the department of children's services to June 30, 2026; requires the department to submit quarterly written reports to the government operations committees during 2024 and 2025 to provide updates on the department's progress in addressing the findings set forth in the December 2022 performance audit report. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29; Title 4, Chapter 3 and Title 37.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 29; Title 4, Chapter 3 and Title 37, relative to the department of children's services.
Sponsors
Rep. John Ragan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 592 | |
2024-03-14 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2024-03-07 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/14/2024 |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/7/2024 |
2024-03-04 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-02-28 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/4/2024 |
2024-01-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2024-01-10 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-09 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1608 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-03 - Effective date(s) 03/27/2024