TN HB1749 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 883
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 883
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, provides that in interpreting a state statute or rule, a court presiding over the appeal of a judgment in a contested case must not defer to a state agency's interpretation of the statute or rule and must interpret the statute or rule de novo; after applying all customary tools of interpretation, the court must resolve any remaining ambiguity against increased agency authority. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 20.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4 and Title 20, relative to state agencies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 883 | |
2022-03-31 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2022-03-31 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-30 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-24 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/31/22 |
2022-03-24 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-24 | House | Reset on cal. for 3/31/2022 |
2022-03-24 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0690) |
2022-03-17 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/24/2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/17/2022 |
2022-03-15 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-08 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/8/2022 |
2022-03-01 | House | Action Def. in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee to 3/8/2022 |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/1/2022 |
2022-02-18 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-16 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-01-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2022-01-20 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2022-01-19 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-01-13 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2285 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-26 - Effective date(s) 04/14/2022