TN HB1746 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-24 - Assigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-24 - Assigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, extends from 4:00 p.m. until 6:00 p.m. the time in which a county election commission must keep its main office open on the days when the commission maintains routine office hours during a period of early voting and on the day of an election. - Amends TCA Title 2.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 2, relative to elections.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee |
2022-01-20 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2022-01-19 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-01-13 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1876 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-22 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee