TN HB1743 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 620
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 620
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the municipal judges conference to provide educational seminars or training for the judges attending the annual meeting and provides that the expenses for judges attending the annual meeting be paid by the administrative office of the courts rather than the municipality in which the judge presides. - Amends TCA Title 17, Chapter 3.
Title
As enacted, requires the municipal judges conference to provide educational seminars or training for the judges attending the annual meeting and provides that the expenses for judges attending the annual meeting be paid by the administrative office of the courts rather than the municipality in which the judge presides. - Amends TCA Title 17, Chapter 3.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Carter [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-06 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 620 | |
2018-03-12 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2018-03-08 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/12/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/8/2018 |
2018-03-06 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/6/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/21/2018 |
2018-01-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2018-01-25 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2018-01-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-22 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1815 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-06 - Pub. Ch. 620