TN HB1739 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 639
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 639
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends the department of correction to June 30, 2024; requires the department to appear back before the government operations committee no later than December 31, 2021, to update the committee on its progress in addressing the findings contained in the January 2020 performance audit report. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 4, Chapter 3.
Title
As enacted, extends the department of correction to June 30, 2024; requires the department to appear back before the government operations committee no later than December 31, 2021, to update the committee on its progress in addressing the findings contained in the January 2020 performance audit report. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 4, Chapter 3.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 639 | |
2020-03-19 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2020-03-18 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/19/2020 |
2020-03-18 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-18 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-03-17 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/18/2020 |
2020-01-23 | House | P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2020-01-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-21 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1661 (Crossfiled) 2020-04-06 - Pub. Ch. 639