TN HB1736 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 34-2)
Status: Passed on May 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-05 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1061
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 34-2)
Status: Passed on May 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-05 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1061
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, permits full-time employees of state public colleges or universities who possess handgun carry permit to carry a handgun while on property owned, operated, or controlled by the employing college or university if certain requirements are met. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 49.
Title
As enacted, permits full-time employees of state public colleges or universities who possess handgun carry permit to carry a handgun while on property owned, operated, or controlled by the employing college or university if certain requirements are met. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 49.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-05 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1061 | |
2016-04-20 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-04-20 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2016-04-19 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/20/2016 |
2016-04-19 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/19/2016 |
2016-04-19 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2016-04-19 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/19/2016 |
2016-04-19 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2016-04-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/18/2016 |
2016-04-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/13/2016 |
2016-04-08 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2016-04-06 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2016-04-06 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-03-30 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 4/5/2016 |
2016-03-29 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2016-03-23 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/29/2016 |
2016-03-23 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2016-03-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/23/2016 |
2016-03-09 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee |
2016-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/9/2016 |
2016-01-26 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2016-01-21 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee--Education Administration & Planning |
2016-01-20 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2016-01-14 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2376 (Crossfiled) 2016-05-05 - Pub. Ch. 1061
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1736&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB1736.pdf |