TN HB1728 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-29 - Taken off notice for cal. in Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, adopts the interstate compact to elect the president by national popular vote. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 15.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, adopts the interstate compact to elect the president by national popular vote. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 15.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-29HouseTaken off notice for cal. in Local Government Committee
2016-03-23HousePlaced on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/29/2016
2016-03-22HouseAction def. in Local Government Committee to 3/29/2016
2016-03-21HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2016-03-16HousePlaced on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/22/2016
2016-03-16HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee
2016-03-09HousePlaced on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/16/2016
2016-03-07HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2016-01-28HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2016-01-26HouseAssigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee
2016-01-21HouseP2C, ref. to Local Government Committee
2016-01-20HouseIntro., P1C.
2016-01-14HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB1657 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-30 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback