TN HB1727 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-23 - Effective date(s) 03/15/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-23 - Effective date(s) 03/15/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, changes compliance requirements for existing training and education requirements of municipal utility board members, utility district commissioners, and the local municipalities and utility districts that they serve; adds reporting requirements for entities regarding certain water for resale contracts; changes certain water loss requirements; transfers certain compliance oversight to the Tennessee public utility commission. - Amends TCA Section 7-34-115; Section 7-82-307; Section 7-82-308; Section 7-82-314; Section 7-82-401; Section 7-82-702; Section 7-82-705; Section 7-82-709; Section 68-221-1010; Section 68-221-1012; Section 68-221-1016; Section 68-221-1206; Section 68-221-1006 and Section 68-221-1009.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 7-34-115; Section 7-82-307; Section 7-82-308; Section 7-82-314; Section 7-82-401; Section 7-82-702; Section 7-82-705; Section 7-82-709; Section 68-221-1010; Section 68-221-1012; Section 68-221-1016; Section 68-221-1206; Section 68-221-1006 and Section 68-221-1009, relative to utilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | Effective date(s) 03/15/2022 | |
2022-03-23 | Pub. Ch. 657 | |
2022-03-15 | Signed by Governor. | |
2022-03-07 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-03-03 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-03-01 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2022-02-24 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2022-02-24 | House | Passed H., Ayes 88, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2022-02-24 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-17 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 2/24/2022 |
2022-02-16 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/17/2022 |
2022-02-15 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 2/15/2022 |
2022-02-08 | House | Action def. in Commerce Committee to 2/15/2022 |
2022-02-02 | House | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 2/8/2022 |
2022-02-02 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee |
2022-01-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business & Utilities Subcommittee for 2/2/2022 |
2022-01-19 | House | Assigned to s/c Business & Utilities Subcommittee |
2022-01-19 | House | P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee |
2022-01-13 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-01-12 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1757 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 657