TN HB1726 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Pub. Ch. 671
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Pub. Ch. 671
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends the advisory council on state procurement to June 30, 2024; adds an attendance requirement for council members. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 4, Chapter 56.
Title
As enacted, extends the advisory council on state procurement to June 30, 2024; adds an attendance requirement for council members. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 4, Chapter 56.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 1 (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 1 (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Pub. Ch. 671 | |
2020-04-06 | Effective date(s) 04/02/2020 | |
2020-04-02 | Signed by Governor. | |
2020-03-24 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2020-03-24 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2020-03-19 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2020-03-19 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2020-03-19 | House | H. concurred in S. am. no. SA1 Ayes 88, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2020-03-19 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment as amended (Amendment 1 - SA0633) |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-03-17 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2020-03-16 | House | Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2020-03-13 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/16/2020 |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/12/2020 |
2020-03-09 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/9/2020 |
2020-01-23 | House | P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2020-01-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-21 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1648 (Crossfiled) 2020-04-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 671