TN HB1724 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 551
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, lowers the age of inactive licensees who may not have to pay a renewal fee pursuant to rules from over 70 years of age to 65 years of age and older. - Amends TCA Title 62, Chapter 1.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, lowers the age of inactive licensees who may not have to pay a renewal fee pursuant to rules from over 70 years of age to 65 years of age and older. - Amends TCA Title 62, Chapter 1.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-26 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-13 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 551
2018-02-27HouseComp. SB subst.
2018-02-22HouseH. Placed on Consent Calendar for 2/26/2018
2018-02-21HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/22/2018
2018-02-14HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2018-02-07HousePlaced on cal. Business and Utilities Committee for 2/14/2018
2018-02-06HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Business and Utilities Committee
2018-01-31HousePlaced on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 2/6/2018
2018-01-30HouseP2C, ref. to Business and Utilities Subcommittee
2018-01-25HouseP2C, ref. to Business and Utilities Committee
2018-01-24HouseIntro., P1C.
2018-01-22HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB2471 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-13 - Pub. Ch. 551

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback