TN HB1724 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-26 - Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, establishes automatic registration of a person to vote when a person applies for a motor vehicle driver license or photo identification license. - Amends TCA Title 2.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, establishes automatic registration of a person to vote when a person applies for a motor vehicle driver license or photo identification license. - Amends TCA Title 2.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-01-26HouseAssigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee
2016-01-21HouseP2C, ref. to Local Government Committee--Government Operations for review
2016-01-20HouseIntro., P1C.
2016-01-14HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB1631 (Crossfiled) 2016-01-21 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback