TN HB1724 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-01 - Assigned to s/c General Sub of S&LG
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-01 - Assigned to s/c General Sub of S&LG
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, allows governor to employ additional counsel to the attorney general or in lieu of the attorney general if the governor determines it is in the interest of the state following consultation with the attorney general. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 6, Part 1.
Title
As introduced, allows governor to employ additional counsel to the attorney general or in lieu of the attorney general if the governor determines it is in the interest of the state following consultation with the attorney general. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 6, Part 1.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-01 | Assigned to s/c General Sub of S&LG | |
2011-02-24 | P2C, ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2011-02-23 | P1C. | |
2011-02-17 | Intro. | |
2011-02-17 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0828 (Crossfiled) 2011-04-14 - Re-ref. to S. Cal. Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1724&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/HB1724.pdf |