TN HB1722 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-03 - Taken off notice for cal. in Local Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-03 - Taken off notice for cal. in Local Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes beer manufacturers to self-distribute beer within a 100-mile radius of the manufacturer if the manufacturer brews 50,000 gallons or less. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 5.
Title
As introduced, authorizes beer manufacturers to self-distribute beer within a 100-mile radius of the manufacturer if the manufacturer brews 50,000 gallons or less. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 5.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-03 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Local Committee |
2020-05-27 | House | Placed on cal. Local Committee for 6/3/2020 |
2020-03-18 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Local Committee for 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-11 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Cities & Counties Subcommittee for 3/11/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Action Def. in s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee to 3/11/2020 |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Cities & Counties Subcommittee for 3/4/2020 |
2020-01-23 | House | Assigned to s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee |
2020-01-23 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Committee |
2020-01-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-21 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1753 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-02 - Failed in Senate State and Local Government Committee