TN HB1716 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-25 - Comp. SB subst.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-25 - Comp. SB subst.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, removes expired requirement that department of human services promulgate rules regarding child restraint system use by children transported by child care agencies no later than January 1, 2007. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 55.
Title
As introduced, removes expired requirement that department of human services promulgate rules regarding child restraint system use by children transported by child care agencies no later than January 1, 2007. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 55.
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Ramsey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-25 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2018-04-24 | House | H. Placed on Final Calendar for 4/25/2018 |
2018-04-12 | House | Reset on cal. for Final Regular Calendar |
2018-04-12 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-05 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/12/2018 |
2018-04-04 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/5/2018 |
2018-03-28 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee with Neutral Recommendation |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-20 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/20/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/14/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Action Def. in s/c Transportation Subcommittee to 3/14/2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 2/28/2018 |
2018-01-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee |
2018-01-24 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee-- Government Operations for Review |
2018-01-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-19 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1759 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-26 - Sponsor(s) Added.