TN HB1712 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-03 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-03 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, provides for the allocation of certain revenue from state and local sales taxes to pay for the capital and operation expenses associated with a new public parking garage in Montgomery County. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 67, Chapter 6, relative to sales and use taxes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-28 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-03-01 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2022-02-28 | House | Passed H., Ayes 89, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2022-02-28 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-24 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/28/2022 |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/24/2022 |
2022-02-22 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-02-16 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-16 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 2/22/2022 |
2022-02-16 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 2/16/2022 |
2022-02-08 | House | Sponsor change. |
2022-02-02 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 2/16/2022 |
2022-01-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 2/2/2022 |
2022-01-25 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2022-01-19 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-01-13 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-01-12 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1794 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-26 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee