TN HB1709 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Pr. Ch. 40
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Pr. Ch. 40
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Pursuant to the request of the Bradford special school district, changes, from $1.82 to $1.98, the property tax rate for the Bradford special school district. - Amends Chapter 153 of the Private Acts of 1917.
Title
AN ACT to amend Chapter 153 of the Private Acts of 1917; as amended by Chapter 53 of the Private Acts of 1995; Chapter 54 of the Private Acts of 2001; Chapter 118 of the Private Acts of 2006 and Chapter 5 of the Private Acts of 2015; and any other acts amendatory thereto, relative to revising the tax rate in the Bradford Special School District.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 76 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 76 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | Pr. Ch. 40 | |
2022-03-28 | Signed by Governor. | |
2022-03-17 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-03-16 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-03-16 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-24 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2022-02-24 | House | Passed H., Ayes 76, Nays 1, PNV 3 |
2022-02-17 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/24/2022 |
2022-02-16 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/17/2022 |
2022-02-15 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 2/15/2022 |
2022-01-13 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2022-01-12 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-01-11 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1766 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-30 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 40