TN HB1707 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 694
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 694
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, permits the state, through the attorney general, to seek an injunction against a person who commits harassment against a state employee. - Amends TCA Title 50.
Title
As enacted, permits the state, through the attorney general, to seek an injunction against a person who commits harassment against a state employee. - Amends TCA Title 50.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-30 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 694 | |
2020-06-01 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2020-05-29 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 6/1/2020 |
2020-05-28 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/29/2020 |
2020-05-27 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 5/27/2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-10 | House | Action def. in State Committee to 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-03-03 | House | Meeting Canceled. Reset on State Committee cal. for 3/10/20 |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-26 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Committee |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service & Employees Subcommittee for 2/26/2020 |
2020-01-23 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee |
2020-01-23 | House | P2C, ref. to State Committee |
2020-01-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-16 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2739 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-30 - Pub. Ch. 694