TN HB1704 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-30 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-30 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, makes defendants convicted for having or selling drugs in school zones eligible for parole after serving 33 percent of the defendant's sentence; eliminates the requirement that defendants serve a mandatory minimum sentence before parole eligibility. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17.
Title
As introduced, makes defendants convicted for having or selling drugs in school zones eligible for parole after serving 33 percent of the defendant's sentence; eliminates the requirement that defendants serve a mandatory minimum sentence before parole eligibility. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17.
Sponsors
Sen. Brenda Gilmore [D] | Sen. Raumesh Akbari [D] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] | Rep. Larry Miller [D] |
Rep. Harold Love [D] | Rep. Barbara Cooper [D] | Rep. Joe Armstrong [D] | Rep. JoAnne Favors [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-30 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2016-03-23 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/30/2016 |
2016-03-23 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2016-03-23 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2016-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/23/2016 |
2016-03-15 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2016-03-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/15/2016 |
2016-03-08 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/15/2016 |
2016-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/8/2016 |
2016-03-01 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/8/2016 |
2016-02-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/1/2016 |
2016-02-23 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/1/2016 |
2016-02-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/23/2016 |
2016-01-26 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2016-01-21 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2016-01-20 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2016-01-14 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1957 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-29 - Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1704&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB1704.pdf |