TN HB1699 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 66-13)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-18 - Conf. comm. report adopted, Ayes 89, Nays 0, PNV 0
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, makes various changes to the law concerning the electronic delivery of health care and its coverage under insurance policies. - Amends TCA Title 56 and Section 63-1-155.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, makes various changes to the law concerning the electronic delivery of health care and its coverage under insurance policies. - Amends TCA Title 56 and Section 63-1-155.

Sponsors

Rep. Robin Smith [R]Rep. Jerome Moon [R]Rep. Dale Carr [R]Rep. Johnny Garrett [R]
Rep. Mark Hall [R]Rep. Gary Hicks [R]Rep. Ron Gant [R]Rep. Curtis Halford [R]
Rep. Timothy Hill [R]Rep. Gregory Terry [R]Rep. Dan Howell [R]Rep. John Crawford [R]
Rep. Paul Sherrell [R]Rep. Rick Eldridge [R]Rep. Justin Lafferty [R]Rep. Chris Hurt [R]
Rep. Larry Miller [D]Rep. Chris Todd [R]Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R]Rep. Pat Marsh [R]
Rep. David Hawk [R]Rep. Dave Wright [R]Rep. John Holsclaw [R]Rep. Kent Calfee [R]
Rep. Kelly Keisling [R]Rep. Esther Helton [R]Rep. Sam Whitson [R]Rep. John DeBerry [D]
Rep. Dennis Powers [R]Rep. Andrew Farmer [R]Rep. Clay Doggett [R]Rep. Rush Bricken [R]
Rep. Brandon Ogles [R]Rep. John Ragan [R]Rep. Mike Carter [R]Rep. Debra Moody [R]
Rep. Jerry Sexton [R]Rep. Jeremy Faison [R]Rep. William Lamberth [R]Rep. Sabi Kumar [R]
Rep. Susan Lynn [R]Rep. Jay Reedy [R]Rep. Lowell Russell [R]Rep. Glen Casada [R]
Rep. Darren Jernigan [D]Rep. Kevin Vaughan [R]Rep. Tom Leatherwood [R]Rep. Bob Ramsey [R]
Rep. Cameron Sexton [R]Rep. Michael Curcio [R]Rep. Mark White [R]Rep. Mike Sparks [R]
Rep. Rick Staples [D]Rep. Terri Lynn Weaver [R]Rep. Yusuf Hakeem [D]Rep. Bill Beck [D]
Rep. Kirk Haston [R]Rep. Bud Hulsey [R]Rep. James Van Huss [R]Rep. Martin Daniel [R]
Rep. Scott Cepicky [R]Rep. Jim Coley [R]Rep. Curtis Johnson [R]Rep. Iris Rudder [R]
Rep. Thomas Tillis [R]Rep. G Hardaway [D]Rep. Bob Freeman [D]Rep. Harold Love [D]
Rep. Jason Powell [D]Rep. Charlie Baum [R]Rep. David Byrd [R]Rep. Andy Holt [R]
Rep. Bill Dunn [R]Rep. Karen Camper [D]Rep. Mary Littleton [R]Rep. Bruce Griffey [R]
Rep. Matthew Hill [R]Rep. John Clemmons [D]Rep. London Lamar [D]

Roll Calls

2020-06-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR 2 AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-18HouseConf. comm. report adopted, Ayes 89, Nays 0, PNV 0
2020-06-17SenateConference Committee appointed. (Bailey, Haile, Yarbro)
2020-06-15HouseConf. comm. appointed. (Smith, Hill (Washington), Freeman)
2020-06-15HouseH. refused to recede from its non-concurrence
2020-06-12HouseH. Placed on Message Calendar
2020-06-11SenateSenate refused to recede from its non-concurrence.
2020-06-01HouseH. nonconcurred in S. am. no. 3 HB1699
2020-03-19SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 29, Nays 0
2020-03-19SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 3 - SA0661)
2020-03-19SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - SA0650)
2020-03-19SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0504)
2020-03-19SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2020-03-19HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2020-03-19HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 88, Nays 0, PNV 1
2020-03-19HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA0593)
2020-03-19HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 3 - HA0707)
2020-03-19HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0550)
2020-03-19HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar 2 for 3/19/2020
2020-03-18HouseAction def. to Next Calendar in Calendar & Rules Committee
2020-03-18HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/18/2020
2020-03-18HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2020-03-18HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 3/18/2020
2020-03-18HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2020-03-17HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/18/2020
2020-03-11HousePlaced behind the budget
2020-03-04HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/11/2020
2020-03-04HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2020-03-03HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2020-02-26HousePlaced on cal. Insurance Committee for 3/3/2020
2020-02-26HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Insurance Committee
2020-02-19HousePlaced on s/c cal Life & Health Insurance Subcommittee for 2/26/2020
2020-02-19HouseAction Def. in s/c Life & Health Insurance Subcommittee to 2/26/2020
2020-02-12HousePlaced on s/c cal Life & Health Insurance Subcommittee for 2/19/2020
2020-02-12HouseMeeting Canceled. Action Def. in s/c Life & Health Insurance Subcommittee to 2/19/2020
2020-02-05HousePlaced on s/c cal Life & Health Insurance Subcommittee for 2/12/2020
2020-01-23HouseAssigned to s/c Life & Health Insurance Subcommittee
2020-01-23HouseP2C, ref. to Insurance Committee
2020-01-22HouseIntro., P1C.
2020-01-16HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1892 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-19 - Companion House Bill substituted

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback