TN HB1699 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 592
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 592
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, specifies that excess instructional time may be used for individualized education program team meetings and school-wide or system-wide instructional planning meetings; requires proposals for use of excess time for instructional planning meetings to be approved by the commissioner of education. - Amends TCA Section 49-6-3004.
Title
As enacted, specifies that excess instructional time may be used for individualized education program team meetings and school-wide or system-wide instructional planning meetings; requires proposals for use of excess time for instructional planning meetings to be approved by the commissioner of education. - Amends TCA Section 49-6-3004.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 592 | |
2018-03-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-08 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2018-03-01 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/8/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/1/2018 |
2018-02-27 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on cal. Education Instruction & Programs for 2/27/2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Instruction & Programs |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee for 2/21/2018 |
2018-01-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee |
2018-01-24 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Instruction & Programs |
2018-01-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-18 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1663 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-26 - Pub. Ch. 592