TN HB1698 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 621
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 621
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, removes provision whereby a processing fee may not exceed five percent of the amount of payment collected by credit or debit card, in regard to the authority for a local government to set and collect a processing fee in an amount that is equal to the amount paid to a third-party processor for processing the payment. - Amends TCA Title 9, Chapter 1.
Title
As enacted, removes provision whereby a processing fee may not exceed five percent of the amount of payment collected by credit or debit card, in regard to the authority for a local government to set and collect a processing fee in an amount that is equal to the amount paid to a third-party processor for processing the payment. - Amends TCA Title 9, Chapter 1.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Pitts [D] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-07 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-31 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 621 | |
2016-03-07 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2016-03-07 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-03-03 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/7/2016 |
2016-03-02 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/3/2016 |
2016-03-01 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2016-02-24 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/1/2016 |
2016-02-24 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2016-02-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 2/24/2016 |
2016-02-17 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2016-02-16 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2016-02-10 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 2/16/2016 |
2016-02-10 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2016-02-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 2/10/2016 |
2016-01-26 | House | Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee |
2016-01-21 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2016-01-20 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2016-01-14 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1838 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-31 - Pub. Ch. 621