TN HB1696 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Safety & Funding Subcommittee of Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Safety & Funding Subcommittee of Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the department to submit common carrier company reports received by the department to the chairs of the transportation committee of the house and the transportation and safety committee of the senate and the comptroller of the treasury within 60 days of receipt. - Amends TCA Title 65 and Title 67.
Title
As introduced, requires the department to submit common carrier company reports received by the department to the chairs of the transportation committee of the house and the transportation and safety committee of the senate and the comptroller of the treasury within 60 days of receipt. - Amends TCA Title 65 and Title 67.
Sponsors
Rep. Pat Marsh [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Safety & Funding Subcommittee of Transportation Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Safety & Funding Subcommittee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-03-03 | House | Meeting Canceled. Reset on Safety & Funding Subcommittee cal. for 3/10/20 |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Safety & Funding Subcommittee for 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-25 | House | Assigned to s/c Safety & Funding Subcommittee |
2020-02-25 | House | Ref. to Transportation Committee |
2020-01-23 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2020-01-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-16 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2905 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-11 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee