TN HB1692 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-24 - Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, classifies as confidential and not open for public inspection records evidencing pet insurance that are provided to local government entities in order to register a dog or cat. - Amends TCA Title 9; Title 10; Title 49; Title 61 and Title 67.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, classifies as confidential and not open for public inspection records evidencing pet insurance that are provided to local government entities in order to register a dog or cat. - Amends TCA Title 9; Title 10; Title 49; Title 61 and Title 67.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-24HouseAssigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
2018-01-24HouseP2C, ref. to State Government Committee
2018-01-22HouseIntro., P1C.
2018-01-18HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB2651 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-05 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback