TN HB1691 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-28 - Taken off notice for cal. in Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-28 - Taken off notice for cal. in Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes, from August 15 to June 1, the date on which a child must be five years of age to enroll in kindergarten; changes, from September 30 to July 31, the date on which a child determined by the director of schools to be sufficiently mature must be five years of age to enroll in kindergarten. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, changes, from August 15 to June 1, the date on which a child must be five years of age to enroll in kindergarten; changes, from September 30 to July 31, the date on which a child determined by the director of schools to be sufficiently mature must be five years of age to enroll in kindergarten. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-28 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Education Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 5/28/2020 |
2020-03-18 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-11 | House | Action def. in Education Committee to 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 3/11/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Action def. in Education Committee to 3/11/2020 |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 3/4/2020 |
2020-02-26 | House | Action def. in Education Committee to 3/4/2020 |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 2/26/2020 |
2020-02-19 | House | Action def. in Education Committee to 2/26/2020 |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on cal. Education for 2/19/2020 |
2020-02-11 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education |
2020-02-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 2/11/2020 |
2020-01-23 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2020-01-23 | House | P2C, ref. to Education |
2020-01-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-15 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1738 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-03 - Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 12/1/2020