TN HB1687 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-28 - Taken off notice for cal. in Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires the board to abolish all academic standards for science and social studies for students in kindergarten through grade two; allows the subjects of science and social studies to be incorporated into the curriculum aligned with the academic standards for English language arts for students in kindergarten through grade two. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires the board to abolish all academic standards for science and social studies for students in kindergarten through grade two; allows the subjects of science and social studies to be incorporated into the curriculum aligned with the academic standards for English language arts for students in kindergarten through grade two. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-28HouseTaken off notice for cal. in Education Committee
2020-05-20HousePlaced on cal. Education Committee for 5/28/2020
2020-03-18HouseMeeting Canceled
2020-03-11HousePlaced on cal. Education Committee for 3/18/2020
2020-03-11HouseAction def. in Education Committee to 3/18/2020
2020-03-04HousePlaced on cal. Education Committee for 3/11/2020
2020-03-04HouseAction def. in Education Committee to 3/11/2020
2020-02-26HousePlaced on cal. Education Committee for 3/4/2020
2020-02-26HouseAction def. in Education Committee to 3/4/2020
2020-02-19HousePlaced on cal. Education Committee for 2/26/2020
2020-02-18HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education
2020-02-12HousePlaced on s/c cal Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee for 2/18/2020
2020-02-11HouseAction Def. in s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee to 2/18/2020
2020-02-06HousePlaced on s/c cal Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee for 2/11/2020
2020-01-23HouseAssigned to s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee
2020-01-23HouseP2C, ref. to Education
2020-01-22HouseIntro., P1C.
2020-01-15HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1735 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-03 - Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 12/1/2020

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback