TN HB1687 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Pub. Ch. 818
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Pub. Ch. 818
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, adds to the definition of "eligible postsecondary institution" for purposes of the Tennessee Promise Scholarship Act of 2014. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As enacted, adds to the definition of "eligible postsecondary institution" for purposes of the Tennessee Promise Scholarship Act of 2014. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
Rep. Eddie Smith [R] | Rep. Rick Staples [D] | Rep. Harold Love [D] | Sen. Raumesh Akbari [D] |
Rep. Johnnie Turner [D] | Rep. Karen Camper [D] | Rep. Harry Brooks [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-16 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Pub. Ch. 818 | |
2018-05-04 | Effective date(s) 08/01/2018 | |
2018-04-27 | Signed by Governor. | |
2018-04-20 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-04-17 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-04-17 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0951) |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-04-11 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2018-04-11 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-11 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 98, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2018-04-11 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA1084) |
2018-04-05 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/11/2018 |
2018-04-04 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/5/2018 |
2018-04-03 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-03-28 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 4/3/2018 |
2018-03-27 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/27/2018 |
2018-03-20 | House | Action Def. in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee to 3/27/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/20/2018 |
2018-03-13 | House | Action Def. in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee to 3/20/2018 |
2018-03-12 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/13/2018 |
2018-03-06 | House | Action Def. in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee to 3/13/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/6/2018 |
2018-01-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee |
2018-01-24 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2018-01-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-18 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1684 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 818