TN HB1686 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-31 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Higher Education of ED of Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-31 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Higher Education of ED of Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires certain prospective recipients of the Tennessee HOPE access grant to enroll in an eligible postsecondary institution no later than 28 months following graduation from high school. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 31; Title 4, Chapter 51; Title 8, Chapter 4; Title 9, Chapter 4 and Title 49.
Title
As introduced, requires certain prospective recipients of the Tennessee HOPE access grant to enroll in an eligible postsecondary institution no later than 28 months following graduation from high school. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 31; Title 4, Chapter 51; Title 8, Chapter 4; Title 9, Chapter 4 and Title 49.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-31 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Higher Education of ED of Education Committee | |
2009-03-25 | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education of ED for 03/31/2009 | |
2009-03-24 | Action def. in s/c Higher Education of ED to 3/31/2009 | |
2009-03-18 | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education of ED for 03/24/2009 | |
2009-03-10 | Assigned to s/c Higher Education of ED | |
2009-02-25 | P2C, ref. to Education | |
2009-02-23 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-19 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0513 (Crossfiled) 2009-03-05 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Ed. Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1686&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB1686.pdf |